There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

CHEER Act
Children's Hospitals Educational Equity and Research Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

CHEER Act
Children's Hospitals Educational Equity and Research Act

Short Titles as Introduced

CHEER Act
Children's Hospitals Educational Equity and Research Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize the Children's Hospitals Graduate Medical Education Program.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9056; text as passed Senate: CR S9056)
05/11/2005Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Enzi with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 109-66.
02/03/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/05/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
07/27/2005-8:14pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9056; text as passed Senate: CR S9056)
05/11/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 98.
05/11/2005SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Enzi with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 109-66.
02/09/2005SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/03/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (21)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions02/03/2005 Referred to
02/09/2005 Markup by
05/11/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-66
House Energy and Commerce07/27/2005 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health08/05/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.285. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/26/2005)

Children's Hospitals Educational Equity and Research Act or the CHEER Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to make payments through FY2010 (currently, through FY2005) to children's hospitals for expenses associated with operating approved graduate medical residency training programs.

Excludes reductions for unused resident positions when calculating the number of full-time residents in a children's hospital's approved training program for purposes of reimbursing direct expenses.

Requires the Secretary to adjust the proportion of such a hospital's costs attributable to wages for differences in hospital wage levels by geographic area.

Authorizes appropriations through FY2010 for direct and indirect expenses associated with operating such programs.

Expresses the sense of the Senate that: (1) perinatal hospitals play an important role in providing quality care and ensuring the best possible outcomes for thousands of seriously ill newborns each year; and (2) medical training programs at perinatal hospitals give providers essential training in treating healthy mothers and babies as well as patients in neonatal intensive care units.