Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/03/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/03/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/03/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 02/08/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/08/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/09/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/14/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/15/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 02/16/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/18/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/18/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/28/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/28/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/01/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/01/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/03/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/03/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/11/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/14/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/23/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/20/2005