Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/19/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/19/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/19/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/19/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/19/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 05/19/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/19/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/13/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/21/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/27/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/13/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/05/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/05/2006