Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 05/23/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 05/23/2006
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/23/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/23/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 05/23/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/23/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/23/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 05/23/2006
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 05/23/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/26/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/05/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/16/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 06/27/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/27/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/29/2006
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/13/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/06/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/07/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/11/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/16/2006