Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/08/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 02/08/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/08/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/08/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/08/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/08/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/08/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 02/08/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/28/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 04/15/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/21/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/21/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/25/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/26/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/26/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 04/26/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/27/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/27/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/27/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/12/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/25/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/25/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 05/26/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/22/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/29/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/01/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/12/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/12/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/12/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/12/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/14/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/14/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/18/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/18/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/19/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/19/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 07/19/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/19/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/21/2005