Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 02/16/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/12/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/28/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/28/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/29/2006