Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/14/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 02/15/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/28/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/03/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/04/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/07/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/10/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/15/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/04/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/04/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/05/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/06/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/12/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/18/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 04/18/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/28/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 05/09/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/10/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/23/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/24/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 05/24/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/25/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/26/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/26/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/06/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 06/23/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/18/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/19/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/21/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/03/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/14/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 11/14/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/14/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/17/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/17/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/18/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/12/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 12/12/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/12/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 12/12/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 12/14/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/16/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/17/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/01/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/02/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/07/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/07/2006
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/15/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/28/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/03/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/07/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/24/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/24/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/24/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/26/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/26/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/27/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/08/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/08/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/24/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew