Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/09/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/09/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/28/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/28/2005
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 03/17/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/17/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/04/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/05/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/07/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/15/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/19/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/26/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/10/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/16/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/30/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/07/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/20/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/28/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/15/2006