Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/16/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/01/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/02/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/02/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/02/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/02/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/08/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/09/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/10/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/14/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 03/14/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/14/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/04/2005
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/04/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/04/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/11/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/12/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/12/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/13/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/14/2005