Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 06/19/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/19/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/19/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/26/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/27/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/05/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/05/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/21/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/26/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/29/2006