Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/10/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/10/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/10/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/15/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/03/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/03/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/03/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/09/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/09/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/09/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 03/09/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/11/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/17/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/17/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/04/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/05/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/12/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/14/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/15/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/29/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew