There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Pueblo of Isletta Settlement and Natural Resources Restoration Act of 2006

Short Titles as Introduced

Pueblo of Isleta Settlement and Natural Resources Restoration Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to compromise and settle all claims in the case of Pueblo of Isleta v. United States, to restore, improve, and develop the valuable on-reservation land and natural resources of the Pueblo, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/29/2006Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 109-354.
07/12/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/29/2006Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 651.
Action By: Senate
09/29/2006Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator McCain without amendment. With written report No. 109-354.
09/14/2006Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/12/2006Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7423-7424)
Action By: Senate
07/12/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7422)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 07/12/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs07/12/2006 Referred to
09/14/2006 Markup by
09/29/2006 Reported by S. Rept. 109-354

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3648. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (09/29/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Pueblo of Isleta Settlement and Natural Resources Restoration Act of 2006 - Establishes in the Treasury the Pueblo of Isleta Natural Resources Restoration Fund for: (1) settlement of the claims of the Pueblo of Isleta; and (2) the acquisition, restoration, improvement, development, and protection of land, natural resources, and cultural resources within the exterior boundaries of the Pueblo. Provides for the maintenance and investment of the restoration fund.

Ratifies the Agreement of Compromise and Settlement entered into between the United States and the Pueblo on July 12, 2005, as modified by the Extension and Modification Agreement executed by the United States and the Pueblo on June 22, 2006, to settle the claims in the case of Pueblo of Isleta v. United States, Docket No. 98-166L, pending in the U.S. Court of Federal Claims.

Directs the Pueblo and the United States to execute and file a joint stipulation for entry of final judgment in dismissal of such case.

Provides for the payment of compensation to the Pueblo from the permanent judgment appropriation for all monetary damages and attorney fees, interest, and other fees and costs of any kind that were or could have been presented in connection with Docket No. 98-166L.