There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Wright Amendment Reform Act of 2006

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Wright Amendment Reform Act of 2006

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Wright Amendment Reform Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend section 29 of the International Air Transportation Competition Act of 1979 relating to air transportation to and from Love Field, Texas.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/13/2006Became Public Law No: 109-352. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2006Signed by President.
10/03/2006Presented to President.
09/29/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 22 (Roll no. 515).(text: CR H8002-8003)
09/29/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2006Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Stevens with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 109-317.
07/13/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/13/2006Became Public Law No: 109-352. (TXT | PDF)
10/13/2006Signed by President.
10/03/2006SenatePresented to President.
09/29/2006-11:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2006-11:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 22 (Roll no. 515). (text: CR H8002-8003)
09/29/2006-10:57pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8026)
09/29/2006-7:39pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/29/2006-6:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3661.
09/29/2006-6:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8002-8011)
09/29/2006-6:50pmHouseMr. Mica moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/29/2006-3:59pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/29/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/2006-3:40pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/29/2006SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2006SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2006SenateS.Amdt.5107 Amendment SA 5107 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2006SenateS.Amdt.5107 Amendment SA 5107 proposed by Senator Hutchison. (consideration: CR S10524-10525; text: CR S10524-10525) In the nature of a substitute.
09/29/2006SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10523-10525; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S10523-10524)
08/01/2006SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 563.
08/01/2006SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Stevens with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 109-317.
07/19/2006SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/13/2006SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/13/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/13/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/13/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/13/2006 Referred to
07/19/2006 Markup by
08/01/2006 Reported by S. Rept. 109-317
House Transportation and Infrastructure10/19/2006 Legislative interest

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.3661. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-352 (10/13/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 29, 2006. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Wright Amendment Reform Act of 2006 - Amends the International Air Transportation Competition Act of 1979, with respect to provisions concerning air transportation to or from Love Field, Texas (the Wright Amendment), to authorize domestic air carriers and foreign air carriers (with respect to foreign air transportation) to offer for sale and provide through service and ticketing air transportation to or from Love Field, Texas, and any U.S. or foreign destination through any point within Texas, New Mexico, Oklahoma, Kansas, Arkansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, and Alabama (effectively expanding domestic and foreign air service to and from Love Field, Texas). Terminates the Wright Amendment eight years after enactment of this Act.

Prohibits: (1) a person from providing nonstop air passenger service between Love Field, Texas, and any point or points outside the 50 states or the District of Columbia; and (2) a federal official or employee from designating Love Field, Texas, as an initial point of entry into the United States or a last point of departure from the United States.

Limits charter flights at Love Field, Texas, to: (1) destinations within the 50 states and the District of Columbia; and (2) no more than 10 per month per air carrier for charter flights beyond the states of Texas, New Mexico, Oklahoma, Kansas, Arkansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, and Alabama. Requires air carriers, with specified exceptions, who lease gate space for flights to and from Love Field, Texas, to depart from and arrive at such gates. Authorizes operators of charter flights from Love Field, Texas, who do not lease gate space to depart from nonterminal facilities or one of the terminal gates at Love Field, Texas.

Requires the city of Dallas, Texas, to reduce the number of gates available for air service at Love Field, Texas, to no more than 20 gates (with a limit thereafter not to exceed a maximum of 20 gates). Prohibits federal funds or passenger facility charges from being used to remove gates at the Lemmon Avenue facility, Love Field, in order to reduce the number of gates, but permits the use of such amounts for other airport facilities.

Prohibits anything in this Act from affecting general aviation service at Love Field, Texas.