Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 07/14/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/14/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 07/14/2006
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/17/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/18/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 07/19/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/21/2006