Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 07/18/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 07/19/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/21/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/27/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/31/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/31/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/06/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/06/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/07/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/25/2006
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/25/2006
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/27/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/27/2006
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/28/2006