Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 07/20/2006
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/25/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/25/2006
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 08/01/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/02/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/05/2006
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/05/2006
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/05/2006
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 09/08/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/11/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/11/2006
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/13/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/13/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/26/2006
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/28/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/28/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/29/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/29/2006
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 11/14/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 12/07/2006