There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the special postage stamp for breast cancer research for 2 years.


Actions Overview (10)

Date
11/11/2005Became Public Law No: 109-100. (TXT | PDF)
11/11/2005Signed by President.
10/31/2005Presented to President.
10/27/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9330)
10/27/2005Committee on Armed Services discharged.
10/27/2005Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
10/27/2005Committee on Government Reform discharged.
09/27/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10520; text as passed Senate: CR S10520)
09/26/2005Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. With written report No. 109-140.
01/24/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
11/11/2005Became Public Law No: 109-100. (TXT | PDF)
11/11/2005Signed by President.
10/31/2005SenatePresented to President.
10/27/2005-4:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/27/2005-4:26pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9330)
10/27/2005-4:26pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9330-9331)
10/27/2005-4:26pmHouseMs. Foxx asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
10/27/2005HouseCommittee on Armed Services discharged.
10/27/2005HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
10/27/2005HouseCommittee on Government Reform discharged.
10/20/2005HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
10/20/2005HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/07/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/05/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
09/28/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/28/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/28/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/28/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/28/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/28/2005-11:06amHouseReceived in the House.
09/27/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10520; text as passed Senate: CR S10520)
09/26/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 221.
09/26/2005SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. With written report No. 109-140.
06/22/2005SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/24/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S228)
01/24/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S227)

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/24/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 01/31/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/31/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/31/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/31/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 02/01/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/01/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/03/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 02/03/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/03/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/03/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 02/03/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/03/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/10/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/10/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/10/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 02/10/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/10/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/14/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/14/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/14/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/16/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/16/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 02/17/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/02/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/07/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/08/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/04/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/04/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/04/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/11/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/11/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/11/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/11/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/11/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/13/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/13/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 06/13/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/13/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 06/13/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/13/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/14/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/16/2005
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 06/21/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/21/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/21/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/21/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/22/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/22/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/22/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/28/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 06/29/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/29/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/29/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/30/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/11/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/11/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/11/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/13/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/14/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/14/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/18/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/20/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/29/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/08/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/27/2005

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/24/2005 Referred to
06/22/2005 Markup by
09/26/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-140
House Government Reform09/28/2005 Referred to
10/20/2005 Markup by
10/27/2005 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce09/28/2005 Referred to
10/27/2005 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/07/2005 Referred to
House Armed Services09/28/2005 Referred to
10/27/2005 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel10/05/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.37. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-100 (11/11/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Extends the U.S. Postal Service's authority to issue special postage stamps to help provide funding for breast cancer research through December 31, 2007.