Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 02/14/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/14/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 02/14/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/14/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/14/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/14/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/14/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/15/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/15/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/15/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/28/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/03/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 03/14/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/15/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/15/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/11/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/12/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 10/26/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/17/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 02/17/2006
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/03/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/21/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/06/2006