Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/12/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/20/2006
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 09/20/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/27/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/28/2006
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 12/05/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 12/05/2006