Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/26/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 07/26/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 07/26/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 07/26/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/26/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 07/26/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/28/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/05/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/11/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/11/2006
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/18/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/28/2006