Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 07/26/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/31/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/06/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/06/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/06/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/06/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/06/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/06/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/08/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/08/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/12/2006
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/14/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/18/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/19/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/19/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/19/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/21/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/21/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/25/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/25/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/27/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/28/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/29/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/29/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/29/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/29/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/29/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/29/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 11/09/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/09/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 11/09/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/09/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/09/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/09/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/14/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/14/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 11/15/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/15/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/16/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/16/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/06/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 12/06/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/06/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/07/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/07/2006