Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/06/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/08/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 09/08/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/08/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/08/2006
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/08/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/08/2006
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 11/13/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/13/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/13/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/16/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/06/2006