Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 08/01/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 08/01/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/06/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/06/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/06/2006
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/06/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/06/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/06/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/06/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/11/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/11/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/11/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/11/2006
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/11/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/11/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/11/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/11/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/11/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/11/2006
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/12/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/13/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/13/2006
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/13/2006
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 09/13/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/13/2006
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/14/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/14/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 09/14/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/14/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/19/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/19/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/19/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/19/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/19/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/20/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/21/2006
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/21/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/21/2006
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/25/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/25/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/25/2006
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/26/2006
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/26/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/26/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 09/26/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 11/13/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/13/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/05/2006