Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 08/03/2006
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 08/03/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/06/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/06/2006
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 09/12/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/21/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/28/2006
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 11/14/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/14/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 12/06/2006