Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 02/15/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/16/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/28/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/02/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/02/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/03/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/11/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/09/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/10/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/10/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/19/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 10/27/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/17/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/17/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/27/2006
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/24/2006