There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Animal Fighting Prohibition Enforcement Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Animal Fighting Prohibition Enforcement Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to strengthen prohibitions against animal fighting, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/29/2005 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR 4/28/2005 S4605-4606)
04/29/2005 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 4/28/2005 S4605-4606)
02/15/2005 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
05/19/2005 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Horticulture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/10/2005 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/02/2005 House Referred to House Agriculture
05/02/2005 House Referred to House Judiciary
05/02/2005 House Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/02/2005 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
05/02/2005-2:03pm House Received in the House.
04/29/2005 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 4/28/2005 S4605-4606)
04/29/2005 Senate Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 4/28/2005 S4605-4606)
02/16/2005 Senate Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1500)
02/15/2005 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 02/17/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/17/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/28/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/28/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/01/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/01/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/02/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/10/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/14/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/04/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/06/2005
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/06/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/06/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/06/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/06/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/06/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/06/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/06/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/11/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/11/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/13/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/26/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/27/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/27/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/28/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/28/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/28/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/28/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/17/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/17/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/12/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 12/12/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/15/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/19/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 01/25/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/16/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/01/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/29/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/27/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/14/2006

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary02/15/2005 Referred to
04/29/2005 Discharged from
House Judiciary05/02/2005 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/10/2005 Referred to
House Agriculture05/02/2005 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock and Horticulture05/19/2005 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (17)

  • Advertising
  • Birds
  • Dogs
  • Evidence (Law)
  • Fines (Penalties)
  • Gambling
  • Interstate commerce
  • Postal service
  • Protection of animals
  • State laws

Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.382. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (04/29/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Animal Fighting Prohibition Enforcement Act of 2005 - Amends the Federal criminal code to prohibit: (1) sponsoring or exhibiting a bird in a fighting venture in a State where it would not otherwise be in violation of the law, only if the person knew that any bird in the venture was knowingly bought, sold, delivered, transported, or received in interstate or foreign commerce for such purpose; or (2) knowingly sponsoring or exhibiting in an animal fighting venture any other animal that was moved in interstate or foreign commerce.

Prohibits knowingly: (1) selling, buying, transporting, delivering, or receiving, for purposes of transportation in interstate or foreign commerce, any dog or other animal to participate in an animal fighting venture; (2) using interstate mail service for commercial speech promoting an animal fighting venture except as performed outside the limits of the States (with an exception for bird fights in States whose laws allow them); or (3) selling, buying, transporting, or delivering in interstate or foreign commerce a knife, gaff, or other sharp instrument to be attached to the leg of a bird for use in an animal fighting venture.

Sets penalties of a fine under the code, two years' imprisonment, or both for violations of this Act. (Repeals conflicting provisions of the Animal Welfare Act.)