Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 02/15/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/17/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/17/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/28/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/28/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/01/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/01/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/02/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/10/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/14/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/04/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 04/06/2005
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/06/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/06/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/06/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/06/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/06/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/06/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/06/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/11/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/11/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/13/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/26/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/27/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/27/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/28/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 04/28/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/28/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/28/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/17/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/17/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/12/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 12/12/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/15/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/19/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 01/25/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/16/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/01/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/29/2006
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/27/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 11/14/2006