There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Popular Titles

Electronic Surveillance bill (Identified by CRS)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill entitled the "Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Improvement and Enhancement Act of 2006".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/07/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
09/08/2006Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 600.
Action By: Senate
09/07/2006Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/11/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/13/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/25/2006
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/26/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/26/2006
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/26/2006

Committees (0)

As of 12/17/2018 text has not been received for S.3877 - A bill entitled the "Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Improvement and Enhancement Act of 2006".

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3877. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/07/2006)

States that specified chapters of the federal criminal code relating to electronic surveillance and the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 (FISA) shall provide the exclusive means by which domestic electronic surveillance may be conducted.

Prohibits any modification or repeal of any provisions of title I (Electronic Surveillance) of FISA without an express legislative directive.

Directs the President to brief each member of the congressional intelligence committees on the Terrorist Surveillance Program of the National Security Agency (NSA) and certain other surveillance programs.

Amends FISA to extend the period allowed for emergency electronic surveillance without a court order.

Authorizes the Attorney General to delegate the authority to approve an application for electronic surveillance and to appoint certain personnel in the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) and the NSA to authorize emergency surveillance in the United States.

Authorizes the appointment of additional judges to the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Court.

Directs the Attorney General to develop and implement a classified document management system to process electronic surveillance applications.

Expands the authority of the President to authorize wartime electronic surveillance without a court order.

Permits electronic surveillance without a court order of communications between individuals outside of the United States under certain circumstances.