Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/08/2006
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 09/08/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/08/2006
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 09/13/2006
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/13/2006
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 09/18/2006
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/18/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/19/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/26/2006
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/26/2006