Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/12/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/21/2006
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/21/2006
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/21/2006
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/21/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/25/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/28/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/28/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/29/2006