Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 09/11/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/11/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 09/11/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 09/11/2006
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/11/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/11/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/11/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/11/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/12/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/13/2006
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/15/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/19/2006
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/19/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/20/2006
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/21/2006
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/27/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/05/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 12/05/2006