Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 09/19/2006
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/19/2006
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/19/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 09/19/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/25/2006
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/26/2006
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/26/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/27/2006
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/29/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/29/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 11/09/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/05/2006