Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 09/26/2006
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/27/2006
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/27/2006
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/27/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/28/2006
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 09/28/2006
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/29/2006
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/29/2006
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/29/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/13/2006
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/13/2006
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/05/2006