Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 02/17/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 02/17/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/17/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 03/01/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/01/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/01/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/01/2005
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/01/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/01/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/01/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/02/2005
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/03/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 03/03/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/04/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/07/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/09/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/09/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/09/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/10/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/10/2005
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/14/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/14/2005
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/15/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/16/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/16/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/17/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/12/2005
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/12/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/27/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/21/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 07/21/2005
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 07/25/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/26/2005
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/27/2005