Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 02/16/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 02/16/2005
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/16/2005
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/28/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 02/28/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/28/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/28/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/28/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 02/28/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/28/2005
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/01/2005
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/02/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/02/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/07/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/08/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/08/2005
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/08/2005
Sen. Nelson, E. Benjamin [D-NE] 03/08/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/08/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO] 03/08/2005
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/08/2005
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/08/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/10/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/10/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/05/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/05/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/11/2005
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/31/2006
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/12/2006
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/13/2006
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/18/2006
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/20/2006
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/20/2006