Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/28/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/04/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/14/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/06/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/06/2005
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/13/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/20/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/30/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/05/2005
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/26/2005
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 10/31/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/27/2006
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/14/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/11/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/05/2006