There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs located in Farmington, Missouri, as the "Robert Silvey Department of Veterans Affairs Outpatient Clinic".


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2006Became Public Law No: 109-414. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2006Signed by President.
12/11/2006Presented to President.
12/06/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 12/7/2006 H8830)
11/16/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11095; text as passed Senate: CR S11095)
11/16/2006Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/18/2006Became Public Law No: 109-414. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2006Signed by President.
12/11/2006SenatePresented to President.
12/06/2006-4:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/06/2006-4:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 12/7/2006 H8830)
12/06/2006-4:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4073.
12/06/2006-4:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR 12/7/2006 H8829-8830)
12/06/2006-4:44pmHouseMr. Brown (SC) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
12/05/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
12/05/2006-10:21amHouseReceived in the House.
11/17/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/16/2006SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11095; text as passed Senate: CR S11095)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 11/16/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs12/05/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.4073. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-414 (12/18/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the outpatient clinic of the Department of Veterans Affairs located in Farmington, Missouri, as the "Robert Silvey Department of Veterans Affairs Outpatient Clinic."