Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/17/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 02/17/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/17/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/25/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/27/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/16/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/26/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 11/18/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/27/2006
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/13/2006
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/20/2006
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/18/2006