Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/17/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/08/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/08/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 11/08/2005
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/14/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 11/14/2005
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 12/16/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 02/09/2006