Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 02/17/2005
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/17/2005
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/17/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/17/2005
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/17/2005
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/17/2005
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 02/17/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/05/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 04/12/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/13/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/13/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/14/2005
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/20/2005
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/09/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/09/2005