There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to deauthorize a certain portion of the project for navigation, Rockland Harbor, Maine.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/05/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text as passed Senate: CR S8977)
09/05/2006Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
02/18/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/07/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/06/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
09/06/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/06/2006-2:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/05/2006SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text as passed Senate: CR S8977)
09/05/2006SenateS.Amdt.4888 Amendment SA 4888 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/05/2006SenateS.Amdt.4888 Amendment SA 4888 proposed by Senator Frist for Senator Jeffords. (consideration: CR S8977; text: CR S8977) To provide for the Herbert Hoover Dike Supplemental Major Rehabilitation Report.
09/05/2006SenateS.Amdt.4887 Amendment SA 4887 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/05/2006SenateS.Amdt.4887 Amendment SA 4887 proposed by Senator Frist for Senator Snowe. (consideration: CR S8977; text: CR S8977) To redesignate the project for navigation, Saco River, Maine.
09/05/2006SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8976-8977)
09/05/2006SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/20/2006SenateS.Amdt.4685 Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
02/18/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1722)
02/18/2005SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1722-1723)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works02/18/2005 Referred to
09/05/2006 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/06/2006 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation09/07/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.466.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.466. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/05/2006)

Deauthorizes: (1) a portion of the project for navigation at Rockland Harbor, Maine; and (2) the portion of the Illinois Waterway project authorized by the River and Harbor Act of 1927 in the South Fork of the South Branch of the Chicago River.

Redesignates a portion of the navigation project, Saco River, Maine, described as a maneuvering basin as an anchorage area.

Directs the Secretary of the Army, by May 31, 2007, to publish a supplement to the major rehabilitation report for the Herbert Hoover Dike system, approved by the Chief of Engineers in November 2000, which shall: (1) evaluate existing conditions at the Herbert Hoover Dike system; (2) identify additional risks associated with flood events at the system that are equal to or greater than the standard projected flood risks; (3) evaluate the potential to integrate Corps of Engineers projects into an enhanced flood protection system for Lake Okeechobee, including the potential for additional water storage north of that lake and an analysis of other project features included in the Comprehensive Everglades Restoration Plan; and (4) review the report prepared for the South Florida Water Management District dated April 2006.

Authorizes appropriations.