Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/02/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/02/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/02/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/02/2005
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/02/2005
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 03/02/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/02/2005
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/02/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/04/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/04/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/07/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/09/2005
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/10/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/10/2005
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/10/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/10/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/10/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/10/2005
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/10/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/16/2005
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [I-VT] 04/04/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/04/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/05/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/06/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/06/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/07/2005
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/11/2005
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 04/11/2005
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/11/2005
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/12/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/14/2005
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/14/2005
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/15/2005
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/19/2005
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/26/2005
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 05/11/2005
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/17/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 10/18/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/27/2006
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/07/2006