Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Talent, Jim [R-MO]* 03/03/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/11/2005
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/25/2005
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/19/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/15/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 09/15/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/05/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/24/2005
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/16/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/27/2006
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/01/2006
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/13/2006
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/28/2006
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 04/27/2006
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/14/2006
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/25/2006
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/26/2006