Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/03/2005
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/09/2005
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/09/2005
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/09/2005
Sen. Dayton, Mark [D-MN] 03/16/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/06/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/11/2005
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/29/2005
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/12/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/05/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/19/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/30/2006
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 08/03/2006