Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/10/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/10/2005
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/04/2005
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/04/2005
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/04/2005
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/11/2005
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/18/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/20/2005
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/10/2005
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/10/2005
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/16/2005
Sen. Allen, George [R-VA] 05/16/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/23/2005