There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of the Interior to convey a parcel of real property to Beaver County, Utah.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2005Became Public Law No: 109-130. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2005Signed by President.
12/12/2005Presented to President.
12/06/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11044-11045)
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9043)
03/30/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 3-17-2005 without amendment. With written report No. 109-43.
01/24/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2005Became Public Law No: 109-130. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2005Signed by President.
12/12/2005SenatePresented to President.
12/06/2005-2:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/06/2005-2:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11044-11045)
12/06/2005-2:29pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 52.
12/06/2005-2:29pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11044-11045)
12/06/2005-2:28pmHouseMr. Radanovich moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:35amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text as passed Senate: CR S9043)
03/30/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 62.
03/30/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 3-17-2005 without amendment. With written report No. 109-43.
02/16/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/24/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/13/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/24/2005 Referred to
02/16/2005 Markup by
03/30/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-43
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health08/02/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.52. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-130 (12/20/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Requires the Secretary of the Interior to convey to Beaver County, Utah, for public recreational use all right, title, and interest of the United States in and to the approximately 200 acres identified as "Minersville State Park."

Permits the County to sell, for not less than fair market value, part of the property conveyed, if the proceeds of such sale are used by the County solely for maintenance of public recreation facilities located on the remainder of such property conveyed to it.