Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/08/2005
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/08/2005
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/04/2005
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/10/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/10/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/10/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/26/2006