Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/03/2005
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/15/2005
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/15/2005
Sen. Corzine, Jon S. [D-NJ] 04/04/2005
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/04/2005
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/06/2005
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/20/2005
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/08/2005
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/15/2005
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/29/2005
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 12/13/2005
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/30/2006
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/26/2006