Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/08/2005
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/08/2005
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/08/2005
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/08/2005
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/09/2005
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/09/2005
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/14/2005
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/14/2005
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/14/2005
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/15/2005
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/15/2005
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/16/2005
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 03/16/2005
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/17/2005