There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the National Trails System Act to require the Secretary of the Interior to update the feasibility and suitability studies of four national historic trails, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9018-9052; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9044; text as passed Senate: CR S9044-9045)
03/30/2005Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 3-17-2005 with amendments. With written report No. 109-44.
01/24/2005Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/27/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/27/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/27/2005-10:33amHouseReceived in the House.
07/26/2005SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9018-9052; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S9044; text as passed Senate: CR S9044-9045)
03/30/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 63.
03/30/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 3-17-2005 with amendments. With written report No. 109-44.
02/16/2005SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
01/24/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/13/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/24/2005 Referred to
02/16/2005 Markup by
03/30/2005 Reported by S. Rept. 109-44
House Resources07/27/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands08/02/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.54.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.54. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (07/26/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on March 30, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the National Trails System Act to direct the Secretary of the Interior to: (1) revise the feasibility and suitability studies for certain existing National Historic Trails for consideration of possible additions to such trails; and (2) study the feasibility and suitability of designating certain routes and cutoffs as components of the Oregon, Pony Express, California, and Mormon Pioneer National Historic Trails and as shared components of the California and Oregon National Historic Trails.